Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2446 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021