Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2446 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2446
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reimbursement of expenses to certain counsel
 appointed to represent a defendant in a criminal proceeding.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 26.05, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (d)  A counsel in a noncapital case, other than an attorney
 with a public defender's office, appointed to represent a defendant
 under this code shall be reimbursed for reasonable and necessary
 expenses, including expenses for:
 (1)  investigation;
 (2)  [and for] mental health and other experts; and
 (3)  if the defendant is imprisoned in a correctional
 facility located more than 50 miles from the court in which the
 defendant's proceeding is pending:
 (A)  travel to the defendant's location for a
 confidential interview; or
 (B)  any costs associated with remotely
 conducting a confidential interview with the defendant.
 (d-1)  Expenses under Subsection (d) incurred with prior
 court approval shall be reimbursed in the same manner provided for
 capital cases by Articles 26.052(f) and (g), and expenses under
 that subsection incurred without prior court approval shall be
 reimbursed in the manner provided for capital cases by Article
 26.052(h).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to expenses incurred on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *