1 | 1 | | 87R10622 CXP-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Price H.B. No. 2467 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the governing body and executive management team of the |
---|
8 | 8 | | independent organization certified to manage the ERCOT power |
---|
9 | 9 | | region. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by |
---|
12 | 12 | | amending Subsections (g) and (g-1) and adding Subsections (g-2), |
---|
13 | 13 | | (g-3), and (g-4) to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (g) To maintain certification as an independent |
---|
15 | 15 | | organization under this section, an organization's governing body |
---|
16 | 16 | | must be composed of persons specified by this section [and selected |
---|
17 | 17 | | in accordance with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization. |
---|
18 | 18 | | The bylaws or protocols must be approved by the commission and must |
---|
19 | 19 | | reflect the input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the |
---|
20 | 20 | | process by which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for |
---|
21 | 21 | | unaffiliated members, prescribe professional qualifications for |
---|
22 | 22 | | selection as a member. The bylaws must require the use of a |
---|
23 | 23 | | professional search firm to identify candidates for membership of |
---|
24 | 24 | | unaffiliated members. The process must allow for commission input |
---|
25 | 25 | | in identifying candidates]. The governing body must be composed |
---|
26 | 26 | | of: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) the chairman of the commission as an ex officio |
---|
28 | 28 | | nonvoting member; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (2) the counsellor as an ex officio voting member |
---|
30 | 30 | | representing residential and small commercial consumer interests; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (3) the chief executive officer of the independent |
---|
32 | 32 | | organization as an ex officio voting member; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (4) six market participants elected by their |
---|
34 | 34 | | respective market segments to serve one-year terms, with: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (A) one representing independent generators; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (B) one representing investor-owned utilities; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (C) one representing power marketers; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (D) one representing retail electric providers; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (E) one representing municipally owned |
---|
40 | 40 | | utilities; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (F) one representing electric cooperatives; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (5) one member representing industrial consumer |
---|
43 | 43 | | interests and elected by the industrial consumer market segment to |
---|
44 | 44 | | serve a one-year term; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (6) one member representing large commercial consumer |
---|
46 | 46 | | interests selected in accordance with the bylaws to serve a |
---|
47 | 47 | | one-year term; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (7) five members representing the public appointed by |
---|
49 | 49 | | the governor to serve four-year terms who are unaffiliated with any |
---|
50 | 50 | | market segment and who have no associations, including familial or |
---|
51 | 51 | | professional associations, with energy producers or providers of |
---|
52 | 52 | | any kind, with: |
---|
53 | 53 | | (A) one member who resides in a county with a |
---|
54 | 54 | | population of less than 75,000; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (B) one member who resides in a county with a |
---|
56 | 56 | | population of at least 75,000 but less than 250,000; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | (C) three members who reside in a county with a |
---|
58 | 58 | | population of at least 250,000 [five members unaffiliated with any |
---|
59 | 59 | | market segment and selected by the other members of the governing |
---|
60 | 60 | | body to serve three-year terms]. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (g-1) The presiding officer and vice presiding officer of |
---|
62 | 62 | | the governing body must be one of the members described by |
---|
63 | 63 | | Subsection (g)(7). |
---|
64 | 64 | | (g-2) Members of the organization's governing body required |
---|
65 | 65 | | by Subsections (g)(4), (5), and (6) must be selected in accordance |
---|
66 | 66 | | with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization. The bylaws or |
---|
67 | 67 | | protocols must be approved by the commission and must reflect the |
---|
68 | 68 | | input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the process by |
---|
69 | 69 | | which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for unaffiliated |
---|
70 | 70 | | members, prescribe professional qualifications for selection as a |
---|
71 | 71 | | member. The bylaws must require the use of a professional search |
---|
72 | 72 | | firm to identify candidates for membership of unaffiliated members. |
---|
73 | 73 | | The process must allow for commission input in identifying |
---|
74 | 74 | | candidates. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (g-3) To qualify to serve as a member of the governing body |
---|
76 | 76 | | under Subsection (g)(4), (5), (6), or (7), a person must have a |
---|
77 | 77 | | primary residence within the geographic area of the power region |
---|
78 | 78 | | served by the independent organization. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (g-4) To maintain certification as an independent |
---|
80 | 80 | | organization under this section, an organization's chief executive |
---|
81 | 81 | | officer and each member of the organization's executive management |
---|
82 | 82 | | team must have a primary residence within the geographic area of the |
---|
83 | 83 | | power region served by the independent organization. |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the |
---|
85 | 85 | | governor shall appoint members to the governing body of an |
---|
86 | 86 | | independent organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities |
---|
87 | 87 | | Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas before September 1, |
---|
88 | 88 | | 2021, to comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by |
---|
89 | 89 | | this Act. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (b) The two members of the governing body of an independent |
---|
91 | 91 | | organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, by the |
---|
92 | 92 | | Public Utility Commission of Texas before September 1, 2021, who |
---|
93 | 93 | | are initially appointed under Sections 39.151(g)(7)(A) and (B), |
---|
94 | 94 | | Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, serve terms expiring |
---|
95 | 95 | | February 1, 2025, and the three members who are initially appointed |
---|
96 | 96 | | under Section 39.151(g)(7)(C), Utilities Code, as amended by this |
---|
97 | 97 | | Act, serve terms expiring February 1, 2023. |
---|
98 | 98 | | (c) An independent organization certified under Section |
---|
99 | 99 | | 39.151, Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas |
---|
100 | 100 | | before September 1, 2021, shall hold elections and select new |
---|
101 | 101 | | members as needed to modify the organization's governing body to |
---|
102 | 102 | | comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, |
---|
103 | 103 | | as soon as practicable, but not later than January 31, 2022. |
---|
104 | 104 | | (d) An independent organization certified under Section |
---|
105 | 105 | | 39.151, Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas |
---|
106 | 106 | | before September 1, 2021, shall ensure that the chief executive |
---|
107 | 107 | | officer and executive management team of the organization comply |
---|
108 | 108 | | with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, as soon |
---|
109 | 109 | | as practicable, but not later than January 31, 2022. |
---|
110 | 110 | | (e) After January 31, 2022, the Public Utility Commission of |
---|
111 | 111 | | Texas may decertify an independent organization whose governing |
---|
112 | 112 | | body, executive management team, or chief executive officer does |
---|
113 | 113 | | not comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this |
---|
114 | 114 | | Act. |
---|
115 | 115 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|