Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2467 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/01/2021

                            87R10622 CXP-D
 By: Price H.B. No. 2467


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governing body and executive management team of the
 independent organization certified to manage the ERCOT power
 region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.151, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (g) and (g-1) and adding Subsections (g-2),
 (g-3), and (g-4) to read as follows:
 (g)  To maintain certification as an independent
 organization under this section, an organization's governing body
 must be composed of persons specified by this section [and selected
 in accordance with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization.
 The bylaws or protocols must be approved by the commission and must
 reflect the input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the
 process by which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for
 unaffiliated members, prescribe professional qualifications for
 selection as a member. The bylaws must require the use of a
 professional search firm to identify candidates for membership of
 unaffiliated members. The process must allow for commission input
 in identifying candidates]. The governing body must be composed
 of:
 (1)  the chairman of the commission as an ex officio
 nonvoting member;
 (2)  the counsellor as an ex officio voting member
 representing residential and small commercial consumer interests;
 (3)  the chief executive officer of the independent
 organization as an ex officio voting member;
 (4)  six market participants elected by their
 respective market segments to serve one-year terms, with:
 (A)  one representing independent generators;
 (B)  one representing investor-owned utilities;
 (C)  one representing power marketers;
 (D)  one representing retail electric providers;
 (E)  one representing municipally owned
 utilities; and
 (F)  one representing electric cooperatives;
 (5)  one member representing industrial consumer
 interests and elected by the industrial consumer market segment to
 serve a one-year term;
 (6)  one member representing large commercial consumer
 interests selected in accordance with the bylaws to serve a
 one-year term; and
 (7)  five members representing the public appointed by
 the governor to serve four-year terms who are unaffiliated with any
 market segment and who have no associations, including familial or
 professional associations, with energy producers or providers of
 any kind, with:
 (A)  one member who resides in a county with a
 population of less than 75,000;
 (B)  one member who resides in a county with a
 population of at least 75,000 but less than 250,000; and
 (C)  three members who reside in a county with a
 population of at least 250,000 [five members unaffiliated with any
 market segment and selected by the other members of the governing
 body to serve three-year terms].
 (g-1)  The presiding officer and vice presiding officer of
 the governing body must be one of the members described by
 Subsection (g)(7).
 (g-2)  Members of the organization's governing body required
 by Subsections (g)(4), (5), and (6) must be selected in accordance
 with formal bylaws or protocols of the organization. The bylaws or
 protocols must be approved by the commission and must reflect the
 input of the commission. The bylaws must specify the process by
 which appropriate stakeholders elect members and, for unaffiliated
 members, prescribe professional qualifications for selection as a
 member. The bylaws must require the use of a professional search
 firm to identify candidates for membership of unaffiliated members.
 The process must allow for commission input in identifying
 candidates.
 (g-3)  To qualify to serve as a member of the governing body
 under Subsection (g)(4), (5), (6), or (7), a person must have a
 primary residence within the geographic area of the power region
 served by the independent organization.
 (g-4)  To maintain certification as an independent
 organization under this section, an organization's chief executive
 officer and each member of the organization's executive management
 team must have a primary residence within the geographic area of the
 power region served by the independent organization.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than December 1, 2021, the
 governor shall appoint members to the governing body of an
 independent organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities
 Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas before September 1,
 2021, to comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 (b)  The two members of the governing body of an independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151, Utilities Code, by the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas before September 1, 2021, who
 are initially appointed under Sections 39.151(g)(7)(A) and (B),
 Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, serve terms expiring
 February 1, 2025, and the three members who are initially appointed
 under Section 39.151(g)(7)(C), Utilities Code, as amended by this
 Act, serve terms expiring February 1, 2023.
 (c)  An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151, Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 before September 1, 2021, shall hold elections and select new
 members as needed to modify the organization's governing body to
 comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act,
 as soon as practicable, but not later than January 31, 2022.
 (d)  An independent organization certified under Section
 39.151, Utilities Code, by the Public Utility Commission of Texas
 before September 1, 2021, shall ensure that the chief executive
 officer and executive management team of the organization comply
 with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, as soon
 as practicable, but not later than January 31, 2022.
 (e)  After January 31, 2022, the Public Utility Commission of
 Texas may decertify an independent organization whose governing
 body, executive management team, or chief executive officer does
 not comply with Section 39.151, Utilities Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.