Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2478 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021