Senate | 05/10/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Record vote RV#297 | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 11/09/2020 | Filed |