Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021