Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2610 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2021

                    By: Harless (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2610
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the deadline to begin a county fire code inspection in
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 233.064, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to
 read as follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (e-1), the [The] county
 shall begin the inspection of the building within five business
 days after the date of the receipt of the written inspection
 request. If an inspection is properly requested and the county does
 not begin the inspection within the time permitted by this
 subsection, the building that is the subject of the request is
 considered approved for the purposes of this subchapter.
 (e-1)  A county with a population of more than 3.3 million
 shall begin the inspection of the building within 10 business days
 after the date of receipt of the written inspection request.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *