Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2610 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021