1 | | - | H.B. No. 2610 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Harless (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 2610 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the deadline to begin a county fire code inspection in |
---|
6 | 12 | | certain counties. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 233.064, Local Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to |
---|
10 | 16 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (e) Except as provided by Subsection (e-1), the [The] county |
---|
12 | 18 | | shall begin the inspection of the building within five business |
---|
13 | 19 | | days after the date of the receipt of the written inspection |
---|
14 | 20 | | request. If an inspection is properly requested and the county does |
---|
15 | 21 | | not begin the inspection within the time permitted by this |
---|
16 | 22 | | subsection, the building that is the subject of the request is |
---|
17 | 23 | | considered approved for the purposes of this subchapter. |
---|
18 | 24 | | (e-1) A county with a population of more than 3.3 million |
---|
19 | 25 | | shall begin the inspection of the building within 10 business days |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2610 was passed by the House on April |
---|
29 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
30 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
31 | | - | No. 2610 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 31, |
---|
32 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2610 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
36 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
37 | | - | 0. |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
40 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Date |
---|
42 | | - | __________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 28 | + | * * * * * |
---|