House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|