Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB265 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/09/2020

                            87R1675 JG-D
 By: Meza H.B. No. 265


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on
 dyslexia and illiteracy among inmates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Not later than June 1, 2022, the Texas
 Department of Criminal Justice shall identify each inmate confined
 in a facility operated by or under contract with the department who
 has dyslexia or is illiterate.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2022, the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice shall prepare and submit to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and each standing committee of the legislature with primary
 jurisdiction over the department a written report that includes:
 (1)  a summary of the department's findings under
 Subsection (a) of this section, including statistical information
 regarding the incidence of dyslexia and illiteracy among inmates;
 and
 (2)  legislative recommendations to address the
 incidence of dyslexia and illiteracy among inmates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.