Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2656 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Moody (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 2656
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to licensing examinations for certain court interpreters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 157.103(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  Examinations shall be offered:
 (1)  in person in each county with a population of
 800,000 or more [the state] at least once [twice] a year at times
 and places designated by the director; or
 (2)  in person at times and places designated by the
 director, if any, and online at least twice a year at times
 designated by the director.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *