Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2660 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2021

                    By: Leman (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2660
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 April 20, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; April 23, 2021, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the jurisdiction and management of the Star of the
 Republic Museum by the Texas Historical Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 442.062(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The museum and its contents, artifacts, structure, and
 land are under the jurisdiction of the commission. The commission
 is responsible for the preservation, maintenance, and operation of
 the museum.
 (c)  Any [Except as provided by Subsection (b), any] power or
 duty related to the museum formerly vested in any other state agency
 or entity is vested solely in the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 442.062(b), Government Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *