Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021