|
06/18/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#1644
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Record vote RV#657
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Amended 1-Ashby
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Record vote RV#645
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Amended 1-Rodriguez
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|