Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2667 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            H.B. No. 2667


 AN ACT
 relating to universal service fund assistance to high cost rural
 areas and the uniform charge that funds the universal service fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.001, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (3) to read as follows:
 (3)  "High cost rural area" means:
 (A)  an area:
 (i)  receiving support under Section
 56.021(1) on December 31, 2020; and
 (ii)  served by a telecommunications
 provider that is subject to rate regulation under Chapter 53; and
 (B)  any other exchange:
 (i)  receiving support under the Texas High
 Cost Universal Service Plan (16 T.A.C. Section 26.403) or the Small
 and Rural Incumbent Local Exchange Company Universal Service Plan
 (16 T.A.C. Section 26.404); and
 (ii)  not excluded by commission rule based
 on the number of telecommunications providers serving the exchange,
 the population density in the exchange, and the number of customers
 served per route mile of plant in service used to provide basic
 local telecommunications service.
 SECTION 2.  Section 56.022, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 56.022.  UNIFORM CHARGE. (a) The universal service
 fund is funded by a statewide uniform charge payable by each
 telecommunications provider and each provider of Voice over
 Internet Protocol service that has access to the customer base.
 (b)  A telecommunications provider or provider of Voice over
 Internet Protocol service shall pay the charge in accordance with
 procedures approved by the commission.
 (c)  The uniform charge is on services and at rates the
 commission determines. In establishing the charge and the services
 to which the charge will apply, the commission may not:
 (1)  grant an unreasonable preference or advantage to a
 telecommunications provider or a provider of Voice over Internet
 Protocol service;
 (2)  assess the charge on pay telephone service; [or]
 (3)  subject a telecommunications provider or a
 provider of Voice over Internet Protocol service to unreasonable
 prejudice or disadvantage; or
 (4)  assess the charge in a manner that is not
 technology-neutral or that grants an unreasonable preference based
 on technology.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 56.024(a) and (b), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission may require a telecommunications
 provider or a provider of Voice over Internet Protocol service to
 provide a report or information necessary to assess contributions
 and disbursements to the universal service fund.
 (b)  A report or information the commission requires a
 telecommunications provider or a provider of Voice over Internet
 Protocol service to provide under Subsection (a) is confidential
 and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 31, 2021, the Public
 Utility Commission of Texas shall initiate the rulemaking to adopt
 the rules required by Section 56.001, Utilities Code, as amended by
 this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2667 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 127, Nays 21, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2667 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 18,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2667 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor