Senate | 04/22/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Record vote RV#386 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Passed as amended | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Amended 1-C. Bell | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Postponed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Record vote RV#353 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Amended 2-Cason | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Amended 1-Howard | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Filed |