Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021