Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2701 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Slaton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 2701
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that individuals joining the Texas
 National Guard sign a notice regarding active combat duty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 437.007, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.007.  ENLISTMENT AND APPOINTMENT; NOTICE.
 SECTION 2.  Section 437.007, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Before an individual may enlist in or accept an
 appointment with the Texas National Guard, the individual shall
 sign the following written notice that is printed in 24-point
 bold-faced type:
 BY JOINING THE TEXAS NATIONAL GUARD I UNDERSTAND THAT I MAY BE
 CALLED TO ACTIVE DUTY BY THE PRESIDENT TO SERVE ON ACTIVE COMBAT
 DUTY IN A WAR DECLARED BY AN ACT OF CONGRESS OR IN ANOTHER ARMED
 CONFLICT AS ORDERED BY THE PRESIDENT. ACTIVE COMBAT DUTY MAY
 INCLUDE:
 (1)  PARTICIPATING IN AN ARMED CONFLICT;
 (2)  PERFORMING A HAZARDOUS SERVICE;
 (3)  PERFORMING A DUTY UNDER CONDITIONS SIMULATING WAR;
 AND
 (4)  PERFORMING A DUTY THROUGH AN INSTRUMENTALITY OF
 WAR.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *