Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2702 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021