Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2708 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 20, 2021