Senate | 05/26/2021 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/10/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Record vote RV#801 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Filed |