Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021