1 | 1 | | 87R544 KKR-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Cortez H.B. No. 280 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to an action plan to expand telemedicine medical services |
---|
8 | 8 | | and telehealth services and increase access to critical medical |
---|
9 | 9 | | care and health care services in this state. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Section 531.021611 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | Sec. 531.021611. ACTION PLAN FOR TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL |
---|
14 | 14 | | SERVICES, TELEHEALTH SERVICES, CRITICAL MEDICAL CARE, AND HEALTH |
---|
15 | 15 | | CARE SERVICES. (a) The commission shall develop and implement an |
---|
16 | 16 | | action plan to: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) expand the use by health care providers of |
---|
18 | 18 | | telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and related |
---|
19 | 19 | | mobile applications for those services and increase access to those |
---|
20 | 20 | | services and applications for the residents of this state; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) increase the availability of critical medical care |
---|
22 | 22 | | and health care services to residents in areas of this state |
---|
23 | 23 | | determined by the commission to be medically underserved, including |
---|
24 | 24 | | rural areas and areas adjacent to an international border. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) In developing and implementing the action plan, the |
---|
26 | 26 | | commission shall: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (1) seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital |
---|
28 | 28 | | Association, the Texas Medical Association, teaching hospitals, |
---|
29 | 29 | | and the statewide health coordinating council; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (2) consult with health care providers, advocacy |
---|
31 | 31 | | groups, relevant federal agencies, and any other interested persons |
---|
32 | 32 | | the commission considers necessary to develop the action plan |
---|
33 | 33 | | required by this section. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) The action plan must include: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) short-term and long-term plan recommendations, |
---|
36 | 36 | | including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the |
---|
37 | 37 | | plan; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) statutory and administrative reforms necessary to |
---|
39 | 39 | | implement the plan; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) options for the funding necessary to implement the |
---|
41 | 41 | | plan. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (d) The commission shall: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) not later than September 1, 2023: |
---|
44 | 44 | | (A) submit to the governor and the legislature |
---|
45 | 45 | | the short-term and long-term plan recommendations, the statutory |
---|
46 | 46 | | and administrative reforms, and the funding options described in |
---|
47 | 47 | | Subsection (c) and the steps for implementing those |
---|
48 | 48 | | recommendations, reforms, and options; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (B) begin implementing the short-term plan; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) not later than September 1, 2025, fully implement |
---|
51 | 51 | | the short-term plan; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (3) not later than September 1, 2031, fully implement |
---|
53 | 53 | | the long-term plan; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | (4) include the short-term and long-term plans in the |
---|
55 | 55 | | update of the strategic plan for health and human services under |
---|
56 | 56 | | Section 531.022. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2032. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|