Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB280 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/09/2020

                            87R544 KKR-D
 By: Cortez H.B. No. 280


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an action plan to expand telemedicine medical services
 and telehealth services and increase access to critical medical
 care and health care services in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.021611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.021611.  ACTION PLAN FOR TELEMEDICINE MEDICAL
 SERVICES, TELEHEALTH SERVICES, CRITICAL MEDICAL CARE, AND HEALTH
 CARE SERVICES. (a) The commission shall develop and implement an
 action plan to:
 (1)  expand the use by health care providers of
 telemedicine medical services, telehealth services, and related
 mobile applications for those services and increase access to those
 services and applications for the residents of this state; and
 (2)  increase the availability of critical medical care
 and health care services to residents in areas of this state
 determined by the commission to be medically underserved, including
 rural areas and areas adjacent to an international border.
 (b)  In developing and implementing the action plan, the
 commission shall:
 (1)  seek the assistance of the Texas Hospital
 Association, the Texas Medical Association, teaching hospitals,
 and the statewide health coordinating council; and
 (2)  consult with health care providers, advocacy
 groups, relevant federal agencies, and any other interested persons
 the commission considers necessary to develop the action plan
 required by this section.
 (c)  The action plan must include:
 (1)  short-term and long-term plan recommendations,
 including policy initiatives and reforms necessary to implement the
 plan;
 (2)  statutory and administrative reforms necessary to
 implement the plan; and
 (3)  options for the funding necessary to implement the
 plan.
 (d)  The commission shall:
 (1)  not later than September 1, 2023:
 (A)  submit to the governor and the legislature
 the short-term and long-term plan recommendations, the statutory
 and administrative reforms, and the funding options described in
 Subsection (c) and the steps for implementing those
 recommendations, reforms, and options; and
 (B)  begin implementing the short-term plan;
 (2)  not later than September 1, 2025, fully implement
 the short-term plan;
 (3)  not later than September 1, 2031, fully implement
 the long-term plan; and
 (4)  include the short-term and long-term plans in the
 update of the strategic plan for health and human services under
 Section 531.022.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2032.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.