Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2827 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2021

                    By: González of El Paso H.B. No. 2827
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer to the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board of certain responsibilities relating to postsecondary
 education and career counseling.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 33.009(a), (b), (c), (e), (h), and (i),
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "coordinating board" ["center"] means
 the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board [Center for Teaching
 and Learning at The University of Texas at Austin].
 (b)  The coordinating board [center] shall develop and make
 available postsecondary education and career counseling academies
 for school counselors and other postsecondary advisors employed by
 a school district at a middle school, junior high school, or high
 school.
 (c)  In developing academies under this section, the
 coordinating board [center] shall solicit input from the agency,
 school counselors, the Texas Workforce Commission, institutions of
 higher education, and business, community, and school leaders.
 (e)  The coordinating board [center] shall develop an online
 instructional program that school districts may use in providing
 the instruction in high school, college, and career preparation
 required by Section 28.016. The program must be structured for use
 as part of an existing course.
 (h)  From funds appropriated for that purpose, a school
 counselor who attends the academy under this section is entitled to
 receive a stipend in the amount determined by the coordinating
 board [center]. If funds are available after all eligible school
 counselors have received a stipend under this subsection, the
 coordinating board [center] shall pay a stipend in the amount
 determined by the coordinating board [center] to a teacher who
 attends the academy under this section. A stipend received under
 this subsection is not considered in determining whether a district
 is paying the school counselor or teacher the minimum monthly
 salary under Section 21.402.
 (i)  From available funds appropriated for purposes of this
 section, the coordinating board [center] may provide to school
 counselors and other educators curricula, instructional materials,
 and technological tools relating to postsecondary education and
 career counseling.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 33.009(f) and (j), Education Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *