Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2827 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021