1 | 1 | | 87R6679 BEF-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: White H.B. No. 2829 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to restaurants and certain alcoholic beverage permittees, |
---|
8 | 8 | | including the rates of certain taxes imposed on items sold by those |
---|
9 | 9 | | establishments and the applicability to those establishments of |
---|
10 | 10 | | certain orders issued in response to a disaster or emergency; |
---|
11 | 11 | | temporarily decreasing the rate of the state sales tax on certain |
---|
12 | 12 | | items; temporarily decreasing the rate of the mixed beverage sales |
---|
13 | 13 | | tax. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 151.051, Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
16 | 16 | | follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 151.051. SALES TAX IMPOSED. (a) A tax is imposed on |
---|
18 | 18 | | each sale of a taxable item in this state. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The] sales |
---|
20 | 20 | | tax rate is 6-1/4 percent of the sales price of the taxable item |
---|
21 | 21 | | sold. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) This subsection applies only to a taxable item sold by a |
---|
23 | 23 | | restaurant that is not a permittee. The sales tax rate is: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) 3.125 percent of the sales price of a taxable item |
---|
25 | 25 | | sold on or after the effective date of the Act enacting this |
---|
26 | 26 | | subsection and before September 1, 2022; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) 3.75 percent of the sales price of a taxable item |
---|
28 | 28 | | sold on or after September 1, 2022, and before December 1, 2022; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (3) 4.375 percent of the sales price of a taxable item |
---|
30 | 30 | | sold on or after December 1, 2022, and before March 1, 2023; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) 5 percent of the sales price of a taxable item sold |
---|
32 | 32 | | on or after March 1, 2023, and before June 1, 2023; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (5) 5.625 percent of the sales price of a taxable item |
---|
34 | 34 | | sold on or after June 1, 2023, and before September 1, 2023. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (d) In this section: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1) "Permittee" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
37 | 37 | | 183.001. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) "Restaurant" means a place where meals are sold |
---|
39 | 39 | | for immediate on-premises consumption. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 2. (a) This section takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) Section 151.051, Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
42 | 42 | | follows: |
---|
43 | 43 | | Sec. 151.051. SALES TAX IMPOSED. (a) A tax is imposed on |
---|
44 | 44 | | each sale of a taxable item in this state. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (b) The sales tax rate is 6-1/4 percent of the sales price of |
---|
46 | 46 | | the taxable item sold. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. (a) Section 183.041, Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
48 | 48 | | read as follows: |
---|
49 | 49 | | Sec. 183.041. TAX IMPOSED ON SALES OF MIXED BEVERAGES AND |
---|
50 | 50 | | RELATED ITEMS. (a) A tax is imposed on each mixed beverage sold, |
---|
51 | 51 | | prepared, or served by a permittee in this state and on ice and each |
---|
52 | 52 | | nonalcoholic beverage sold, prepared, or served by a permittee in |
---|
53 | 53 | | this state for the purpose of being mixed with an alcoholic beverage |
---|
54 | 54 | | and consumed on the premises of the permittee. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (b) The rate of the tax is: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (1) 2.25 percent of the sales price of an item sold, |
---|
57 | 57 | | prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on the effective date of the |
---|
58 | 58 | | Act enacting this subdivision and before 3 a.m. on September 1, |
---|
59 | 59 | | 2022; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (2) 3.45 percent of the sales price of an item sold, |
---|
61 | 61 | | prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on September 1, 2022, and |
---|
62 | 62 | | before 3 a.m. on December 1, 2022; |
---|
63 | 63 | | (3) 4.65 percent of the sales price of an item sold, |
---|
64 | 64 | | prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on December 1, 2022, and |
---|
65 | 65 | | before 3 a.m. on March 1, 2023; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (4) 5.85 percent of the sales price of an item sold, |
---|
67 | 67 | | prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on March 1, 2023, and before 3 |
---|
68 | 68 | | a.m. on June 1, 2023; and |
---|
69 | 69 | | (5) 7.05 percent of the sales price of an item sold, |
---|
70 | 70 | | prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on June 1, 2023, and before 3 |
---|
71 | 71 | | a.m. on September 1, 2023 [8.25 percent of the sales price of the |
---|
72 | 72 | | item sold, prepared, or served]. |
---|
73 | 73 | | (b) The change in law made by this section applies beginning |
---|
74 | 74 | | at 3 a.m. on the effective date of this Act. The law in effect |
---|
75 | 75 | | immediately before the effective date of this Act continues in |
---|
76 | 76 | | effect until 3 a.m. on the effective date of this Act. |
---|
77 | 77 | | SECTION 4. (a) This section takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (b) Section 183.041, Tax Code, is amended to read as |
---|
79 | 79 | | follows: |
---|
80 | 80 | | Sec. 183.041. TAX IMPOSED ON SALES OF MIXED BEVERAGES AND |
---|
81 | 81 | | RELATED ITEMS. (a) A tax is imposed on each mixed beverage sold, |
---|
82 | 82 | | prepared, or served by a permittee in this state and on ice and each |
---|
83 | 83 | | nonalcoholic beverage sold, prepared, or served by a permittee in |
---|
84 | 84 | | this state for the purpose of being mixed with an alcoholic beverage |
---|
85 | 85 | | and consumed on the premises of the permittee. |
---|
86 | 86 | | (b) The rate of the tax is 8.25 percent of the sales price of |
---|
87 | 87 | | the item sold, prepared, or served. |
---|
88 | 88 | | (c) The change in law made by this section applies beginning |
---|
89 | 89 | | at 3 a.m. on the effective date of this section. The law in effect |
---|
90 | 90 | | immediately before the effective date of this section continues in |
---|
91 | 91 | | effect until 3 a.m. on the effective date of this section. |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 5. (a) In this section: |
---|
93 | 93 | | (1) "Permittee" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
94 | 94 | | 183.001, Tax Code; and |
---|
95 | 95 | | (2) "Restaurant" has the meaning assigned by Section |
---|
96 | 96 | | 151.051(d), Tax Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
97 | 97 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other law, an executive order |
---|
98 | 98 | | issued under Section 418.012, Government Code, or an order issued |
---|
99 | 99 | | in response to a disaster or emergency by a political subdivision of |
---|
100 | 100 | | this state that applied to a permittee or restaurant immediately |
---|
101 | 101 | | before the effective date of this Act does not apply to a permittee |
---|
102 | 102 | | or restaurant on or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
103 | 103 | | SECTION 6. A change in law made by this Act does not affect |
---|
104 | 104 | | tax liability accruing before the effective date of the change in |
---|
105 | 105 | | law. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been |
---|
106 | 106 | | enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the |
---|
107 | 107 | | collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of |
---|
108 | 108 | | the liability for those taxes. |
---|
109 | 109 | | SECTION 7. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
110 | 110 | | Act takes effect July 1, 2021, if it receives a vote of two-thirds |
---|
111 | 111 | | of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, |
---|
112 | 112 | | Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the |
---|
113 | 113 | | vote necessary to take effect July 1, 2021, this Act takes effect |
---|
114 | 114 | | September 1, 2021, except as otherwise provided by this Act. |
---|