Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2829 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/04/2021

                            87R6679 BEF-D
 By: White H.B. No. 2829


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restaurants and certain alcoholic beverage permittees,
 including the rates of certain taxes imposed on items sold by those
 establishments and the applicability to those establishments of
 certain orders issued in response to a disaster or emergency;
 temporarily decreasing the rate of the state sales tax on certain
 items; temporarily decreasing the rate of the mixed beverage sales
 tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.051, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.051.  SALES TAX IMPOSED. (a) A tax is imposed on
 each sale of a taxable item in this state.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The] sales
 tax rate is 6-1/4 percent of the sales price of the taxable item
 sold.
 (c)  This subsection applies only to a taxable item sold by a
 restaurant that is not a permittee. The sales tax rate is:
 (1)  3.125 percent of the sales price of a taxable item
 sold on or after the effective date of the Act enacting this
 subsection and before September 1, 2022;
 (2)  3.75 percent of the sales price of a taxable item
 sold on or after September 1, 2022, and before December 1, 2022;
 (3)  4.375 percent of the sales price of a taxable item
 sold on or after December 1, 2022, and before March 1, 2023;
 (4)  5 percent of the sales price of a taxable item sold
 on or after March 1, 2023, and before June 1, 2023; and
 (5)  5.625 percent of the sales price of a taxable item
 sold on or after June 1, 2023, and before September 1, 2023.
 (d)  In this section:
 (1)  "Permittee" has the meaning assigned by Section
 183.001.
 (2)  "Restaurant" means a place where meals are sold
 for immediate on-premises consumption.
 SECTION 2.  (a) This section takes effect September 1, 2023.
 (b)  Section 151.051, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 151.051.  SALES TAX IMPOSED. (a) A tax is imposed on
 each sale of a taxable item in this state.
 (b)  The sales tax rate is 6-1/4 percent of the sales price of
 the taxable item sold.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Section 183.041, Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 183.041.  TAX IMPOSED ON SALES OF MIXED BEVERAGES AND
 RELATED ITEMS. (a) A tax is imposed on each mixed beverage sold,
 prepared, or served by a permittee in this state and on ice and each
 nonalcoholic beverage sold, prepared, or served by a permittee in
 this state for the purpose of being mixed with an alcoholic beverage
 and consumed on the premises of the permittee.
 (b)  The rate of the tax is:
 (1)  2.25 percent of the sales price of an item sold,
 prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on the effective date of the
 Act enacting this subdivision and before 3 a.m. on September 1,
 2022;
 (2)  3.45 percent of the sales price of an item sold,
 prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on September 1, 2022, and
 before 3 a.m. on December 1, 2022;
 (3)  4.65 percent of the sales price of an item sold,
 prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on December 1, 2022, and
 before 3 a.m. on March 1, 2023;
 (4)  5.85 percent of the sales price of an item sold,
 prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on March 1, 2023, and before 3
 a.m. on June 1, 2023; and
 (5)  7.05 percent of the sales price of an item sold,
 prepared, or served at or after 3 a.m. on June 1, 2023, and before 3
 a.m. on September 1, 2023 [8.25 percent of the sales price of the
 item sold, prepared, or served].
 (b)  The change in law made by this section applies beginning
 at 3 a.m. on the effective date of this Act. The law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act continues in
 effect until 3 a.m. on the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a) This section takes effect September 1, 2023.
 (b)  Section 183.041, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 183.041.  TAX IMPOSED ON SALES OF MIXED BEVERAGES AND
 RELATED ITEMS. (a) A tax is imposed on each mixed beverage sold,
 prepared, or served by a permittee in this state and on ice and each
 nonalcoholic beverage sold, prepared, or served by a permittee in
 this state for the purpose of being mixed with an alcoholic beverage
 and consumed on the premises of the permittee.
 (b)  The rate of the tax is 8.25 percent of the sales price of
 the item sold, prepared, or served.
 (c)  The change in law made by this section applies beginning
 at 3 a.m. on the effective date of this section. The law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this section continues in
 effect until 3 a.m. on the effective date of this section.
 SECTION 5.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Permittee" has the meaning assigned by Section
 183.001, Tax Code; and
 (2)  "Restaurant" has the meaning assigned by Section
 151.051(d), Tax Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, an executive order
 issued under Section 418.012, Government Code, or an order issued
 in response to a disaster or emergency by a political subdivision of
 this state that applied to a permittee or restaurant immediately
 before the effective date of this Act does not apply to a permittee
 or restaurant on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  A change in law made by this Act does not affect
 tax liability accruing before the effective date of the change in
 law. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 7.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect July 1, 2021, if it receives a vote of two-thirds
 of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39,
 Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary to take effect July 1, 2021, this Act takes effect
 September 1, 2021, except as otherwise provided by this Act.