Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2903 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021