Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2947 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021