Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB295 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 295
1+By: Murr, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 295
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2021;
3+ May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Jurisprudence; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
6+ May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 295 By: Huffman
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the provision of funding for indigent defense services.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
715 SECTION 1. Section 79.037(a), Government Code, is amended
816 to read as follows:
917 (a) The commission shall:
1018 (1) provide technical support to:
1119 (A) assist counties in improving their systems
1220 for providing indigent defense services, including indigent
1321 defense support services [systems]; and
1422 (B) promote compliance by counties with the
1523 requirements of state law relating to indigent defense;
1624 (2) to assist a county in providing or improving the
1725 provision of indigent defense services in the county, distribute in
1826 the form of grants any funds appropriated for the purposes of this
1927 section to one or more of the following entities:
2028 (A) the county;
2129 (B) a law school's legal clinic or program that
2230 provides indigent defense services in the county; [and]
2331 (C) a regional public defender that meets the
2432 requirements of Subsection (e) and provides indigent defense
2533 services in the county; [and]
2634 (D) an entity described by Section 791.013 that
2735 provides to a county administrative services under an interlocal
2836 contract entered into for the purpose of providing or improving the
2937 provision of indigent defense services in the county; and
3038 (E) a nonprofit corporation that provides
3139 indigent defense services or indigent defense support services in
3240 the county; and
3341 (3) monitor each entity that receives a grant under
3442 Subdivision (2) and enforce compliance with the conditions of the
3543 grant, including enforcement by:
3644 (A) withdrawing grant funds; or
3745 (B) requiring reimbursement of grant funds by the
3846 entity.
3947 SECTION 2. Section 79.037(b), Government Code, as amended
4048 by Chapters 56 (S.B. 1353) and 476 (S.B. 1057), Acts of the 84th
4149 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended to
4250 read as follows:
4351 (b) The commission shall determine for each county the
4452 entity or entities [within the county] that are eligible to receive
4553 funds for the provision of or improvement in the provision of
4654 indigent defense services under Subsection (a)(2). The
4755 determination must be made based on the entity's:
4856 (1) compliance with standards adopted by the board;
4957 and
5058 (2) demonstrated commitment to compliance with the
5159 requirements of state law relating to indigent defense.
5260 SECTION 3. Section 79.037(c), Government Code, as amended
5361 by Chapters 56 (S.B. 1353) and 476 (S.B. 1057), Acts of the 84th
5462 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted to read as
5563 follows:
5664 (c) The board shall adopt policies to ensure that funds
5765 under Subsection (a)(2) are allocated and distributed in a fair
5866 manner.
5967 SECTION 4. Section 26.0442(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
6068 as follows:
6169 (a) In this section, "indigent defense compensation
6270 expenditures" for a tax year means the difference between:
6371 (1) the amount paid by a county in the period beginning
6472 on July 1 of the tax year preceding the tax year for which the tax is
6573 adopted and ending on June 30 of the tax year for which the tax is
6674 adopted to:
6775 (A) provide appointed counsel for indigent
6876 individuals in criminal or civil proceedings in accordance with the
6977 schedule of fees adopted under Article 26.05, Code of Criminal
7078 Procedure; and
7179 (B) fund the operations of a public defender's
7280 office under Article 26.044, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
7381 (2) [, in the period beginning on July 1 of the tax
7482 year preceding the tax year for which the tax is adopted and ending
7583 on June 30 of the tax year for which the tax is adopted, less] the
7684 amount of any state grants received by the county during that period
7785 for those purposes [the same purpose].
7886 SECTION 5. Section 79.037(e), Government Code, as added by
7987 Chapter 56 (S.B. 1353), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
8088 Session, 2015, is repealed.
8189 SECTION 6. Section 26.0442, Tax Code, as amended by this
8290 Act, applies to the calculation of the no-new-revenue maintenance
8391 and operations rate for a county only for a tax year beginning on or
8492 after January 1, 2022.
8593 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
86- ______________________________ ______________________________
87- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
88- I certify that H.B. No. 295 was passed by the House on April
89- 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
90- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
91- No. 295 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1
92- present, not voting.
93- ______________________________
94- Chief Clerk of the House
95- I certify that H.B. No. 295 was passed by the Senate, with
96- amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
97- 0.
98- ______________________________
99- Secretary of the Senate
100- APPROVED: __________________
101- Date
102- __________________
103- Governor
94+ * * * * *