Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB295 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            H.B. No. 295


 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of funding for indigent defense services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 79.037(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall:
 (1)  provide technical support to:
 (A)  assist counties in improving their systems
 for providing indigent defense services, including indigent
 defense support services [systems]; and
 (B)  promote compliance by counties with the
 requirements of state law relating to indigent defense;
 (2)  to assist a county in providing or improving the
 provision of indigent defense services in the county, distribute in
 the form of grants any funds appropriated for the purposes of this
 section to one or more of the following entities:
 (A)  the county;
 (B)  a law school's legal clinic or program that
 provides indigent defense services in the county; [and]
 (C)  a regional public defender that meets the
 requirements of Subsection (e) and provides indigent defense
 services in the county; [and]
 (D)  an entity described by Section 791.013 that
 provides to a county administrative services under an interlocal
 contract entered into for the purpose of providing or improving the
 provision of indigent defense services in the county; and
 (E)  a nonprofit corporation that provides
 indigent defense services or indigent defense support services in
 the county; and
 (3)  monitor each entity that receives a grant under
 Subdivision (2) and enforce compliance with the conditions of the
 grant, including enforcement by:
 (A)  withdrawing grant funds; or
 (B)  requiring reimbursement of grant funds by the
 entity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 79.037(b), Government Code, as amended
 by Chapters 56 (S.B. 1353) and 476 (S.B. 1057), Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The commission shall determine for each county the
 entity or entities [within the county] that are eligible to receive
 funds for the provision of or improvement in the provision of
 indigent defense services under Subsection (a)(2). The
 determination must be made based on the entity's:
 (1)  compliance with standards adopted by the board;
 and
 (2)  demonstrated commitment to compliance with the
 requirements of state law relating to indigent defense.
 SECTION 3.  Section 79.037(c), Government Code, as amended
 by Chapters 56 (S.B. 1353) and 476 (S.B. 1057), Acts of the 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted to read as
 follows:
 (c)  The board shall adopt policies to ensure that funds
 under Subsection (a)(2) are allocated and distributed in a fair
 manner.
 SECTION 4.  Section 26.0442(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "indigent defense compensation
 expenditures" for a tax year means the difference between:
 (1)  the amount paid by a county in the period beginning
 on July 1 of the tax year preceding the tax year for which the tax is
 adopted and ending on June 30 of the tax year for which the tax is
 adopted to:
 (A)  provide appointed counsel for indigent
 individuals in criminal or civil proceedings in accordance with the
 schedule of fees adopted under Article 26.05, Code of Criminal
 Procedure; and
 (B)  fund the operations of a public defender's
 office under Article 26.044, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  [, in the period beginning on July 1 of the tax
 year preceding the tax year for which the tax is adopted and ending
 on June 30 of the tax year for which the tax is adopted, less] the
 amount of any state grants received by the county during that period
 for those purposes [the same purpose].
 SECTION 5.  Section 79.037(e), Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 56 (S.B. 1353), Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  Section 26.0442, Tax Code, as amended by this
 Act, applies to the calculation of the no-new-revenue maintenance
 and operations rate for a county only for a tax year beginning on or
 after January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 295 was passed by the House on April
 22, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 295 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 295 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor