Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 5, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021