Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2998 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2998
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021;
 May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain business entities obtain a
 license from the Texas Real Estate Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1101.355, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c) or any other law, a
 business entity is not required to be licensed under this chapter if
 the business entity:
 (1)  receives compensation on behalf of a broker or
 sales agent licensed under this chapter that is earned by the
 license holder while engaged in real estate brokerage;
 (2)  performs no other acts of a broker;
 (3)  is:
 (A)  a limited liability company as defined by
 Section 101.001, Business Organizations Code; or
 (B)  an S corporation as defined by 26 U.S.C.
 Section 1361;
 (4)  is registered with the commission; and
 (5)  is at least 51 percent owned by the license holder
 on whose behalf the entity receives compensation.
 (e)  The commission shall adopt rules providing for the
 registration of a business entity described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 * * * * *