Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB30 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021