Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#1099
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#1079
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 8-Leach, Hefner, Shaheen, Patterson, Kacal, Price, Sanford, Hull, Holland, Anderson, and Larson
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 7-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 6-J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 4-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn 5-Biedermann
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 4-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 3-Gervin-Hawkins
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#1078
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amended 2-Gervin-Hawkins, Pacheco, Cortez, Bernal, Larson, Martinez Fischer, Minjarez, Allison, and Campos
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-Leach, et al.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Leach, Shaheen, K. King, Goldman, Hefner, Sanford, Holland, Canales, Patterson, Kacal, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|