Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3078 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/17/2021

                            By: Bailes, Guillen, Murr H.B. No. 3078
 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the registration of certain motor vehicles as farm or
 ranch vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 502.433, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.433.  FEE:  COMMERCIAL FARM OR RANCH MOTOR VEHICLE.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 502.433(a) and (d), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The registration fee for a commercial motor vehicle as a
 farm vehicle or ranch vehicle is 50 percent of the applicable fee
 under Section 502.252 or 502.253, as applicable, if the vehicle's
 owner will use the vehicle for commercial purposes only to
 transport:
 (1)  the person's own poultry, dairy, livestock,
 livestock products, timber in its natural state, or farm products
 to market or another place for sale or processing;
 (2)  laborers from their place of residence to the
 owner's farm or ranch; or
 (3)  without charge, materials, tools, equipment, or
 supplies from the place of purchase or storage to the owner's farm
 or ranch exclusively for the owner's use or for use on the farm or
 ranch.
 (d)  The department shall provide separate distinguishing
 license plates for farm and ranch vehicles [a vehicle] registered
 under this section. The department shall provide a person who
 registers a vehicle under this section the option of designating
 the vehicle as a farm vehicle or a ranch vehicle.
 SECTION 3.  Section 545.413(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that:
 (1)  the person possesses a written statement from a
 licensed physician stating that for a medical reason the person
 should not wear a safety belt;
 (2)  the person presents to the court, not later than
 the 10th day after the date of the offense, a statement from a
 licensed physician stating that for a medical reason the person
 should not wear a safety belt;
 (3)  the person is employed by the United States Postal
 Service and performing a duty for that agency that requires the
 operator to service postal boxes from a vehicle or that requires
 frequent entry into and exit from a vehicle;
 (4)  the person is engaged in the actual delivery of
 newspapers from a vehicle or is performing newspaper delivery
 duties that require frequent entry into and exit from a vehicle;
 (5)  the person is employed by a public or private
 utility company and is engaged in the reading of meters or
 performing a similar duty for that company requiring the operator
 to frequently enter into and exit from a vehicle;
 (6)  the person is operating a commercial vehicle
 registered as a farm or ranch vehicle under the provisions of
 Section 502.433 that does not have a gross weight, registered
 weight, or gross weight rating of 48,000 pounds or more; or
 (7)  the person is the operator of or a passenger in a
 vehicle used exclusively to transport solid waste and performing
 duties that require frequent entry into and exit from the vehicle.
 SECTION 4.  Section 622.074, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 622.074.  NONAPPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER.  This
 subchapter does not apply to:
 (1)  farm equipment used for a purpose other than
 construction;
 (2)  special mobile equipment owned by a dealer or
 distributor;
 (3)  a vehicle used to propel special mobile equipment
 that is registered as a farm or ranch vehicle under Section 502.433;
 or
 (4)  equipment while being used by a commercial hauler
 to transport special mobile equipment under hire of a person who
 derives $500 in gross receipts annually from a farming or ranching
 enterprise.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *