Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3078 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021