Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021