Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3097 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/22/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             May 22, 2021       TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3097 by Stephenson (Relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and convention center project.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted     No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated. The bill would amend Section 351.157, Tax Code, regarding municipalities eligible for additional entitlement to state sales tax and local mixed beverage tax revenue for qualified projects. The bill would amend Section 351.157(e) to extend the date of project commencement required to receive revenue under the section from before September 1, 2023, to before September 1, 2027. The bill would add Section 351.157(f) to clarify that a city commences a qualified project on the date the city by ordinance or resolution authorizes the issuance of bonds or other obligations related to the project or executes or amends a contract or interlocal agreement related to the project.Absent the extension of time for project commencement proposed by the bill, it would be expected that cities would take action for project commencement sufficient to meet the date for entitlement to revenue provided by current law. Consequently, the bill would have no fiscal implications for the state.The bill would take effect immediately upon enactment, assuming it received the requisite two-thirds majority votes in both houses of the Legislature. Otherwise, it would take effect September 1, 2021.  Local Government ImpactNo fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.  Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts  LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AJL, BRI, KK, SD

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 87TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 22, 2021

 

 

  TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB3097 by Stephenson (Relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and convention center project.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted   

TO: Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3097 by Stephenson (Relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and convention center project.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Honorable Brian Birdwell, Chair, Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Economic Development

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB3097 by Stephenson (Relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and convention center project.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted 

 HB3097 by Stephenson (Relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and convention center project.), Committee Report 2nd House, Substituted 



No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

The bill would amend Section 351.157, Tax Code, regarding municipalities eligible for additional entitlement to state sales tax and local mixed beverage tax revenue for qualified projects. The bill would amend Section 351.157(e) to extend the date of project commencement required to receive revenue under the section from before September 1, 2023, to before September 1, 2027. The bill would add Section 351.157(f) to clarify that a city commences a qualified project on the date the city by ordinance or resolution authorizes the issuance of bonds or other obligations related to the project or executes or amends a contract or interlocal agreement related to the project.Absent the extension of time for project commencement proposed by the bill, it would be expected that cities would take action for project commencement sufficient to meet the date for entitlement to revenue provided by current law. Consequently, the bill would have no fiscal implications for the state.The bill would take effect immediately upon enactment, assuming it received the requisite two-thirds majority votes in both houses of the Legislature. Otherwise, it would take effect September 1, 2021.

Absent the extension of time for project commencement proposed by the bill, it would be expected that cities would take action for project commencement sufficient to meet the date for entitlement to revenue provided by current law. Consequently, the bill would have no fiscal implications for the state.The bill would take effect immediately upon enactment, assuming it received the requisite two-thirds majority votes in both houses of the Legislature. Otherwise, it would take effect September 1, 2021.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, AJL, BRI, KK, SD

JMc, AJL, BRI, KK, SD