Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | + | 87R10068 RDS-F | |
1 | 2 | By: Stephenson, Jetton, Reynolds H.B. No. 3097 | |
2 | - | (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) | |
3 | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021; | |
4 | - | May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural | |
5 | - | Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported | |
6 | - | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following | |
7 | - | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) | |
8 | - | Click here to see the committee vote | |
9 | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3097 By: Zaffirini | |
10 | 3 | ||
11 | 4 | ||
12 | 5 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
13 | 6 | AN ACT | |
14 | 7 | relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax | |
15 | 8 | revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and | |
16 | 9 | convention center project. | |
17 | 10 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
18 | 11 | SECTION 1. Section 351.157, Tax Code, is amended by | |
19 | 12 | amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as | |
20 | 13 | follows: | |
21 | 14 | (e) A municipality to which this section applies is not | |
22 | 15 | entitled to receive revenue under Subsection (d) unless the | |
23 | 16 | municipality commences a qualified project under this subchapter | |
24 | - | before September 1, | |
17 | + | before September 1, 2025 [2023]. | |
25 | 18 | (f) For purposes of Subsection (e), a municipality | |
26 | 19 | commences a qualified project on the date the municipality, by | |
27 | 20 | ordinance or resolution: | |
28 | 21 | (1) authorizes the issuance of bonds or other | |
29 | 22 | obligations related to the qualified project; or | |
30 | - | (2) executes: | |
23 | + | (2) executes or amends: | |
31 | 24 | (A) a contract authorized by Chapter 380, Local | |
32 | 25 | Government Code, related to the qualified project; or | |
33 | 26 | (B) an interlocal agreement related to the | |
34 | 27 | qualified project. | |
35 | 28 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
36 | 29 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
37 | 30 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
38 | 31 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
39 | 32 | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. | |
40 | - | * * * * * |