Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3097 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Stephenson, Jetton, Reynolds H.B. No. 3097
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffman)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3097 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to entitlement of certain municipalities to receive tax
 revenue from certain establishments located near a hotel and
 convention center project.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.157, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  A municipality to which this section applies is not
 entitled to receive revenue under Subsection (d) unless the
 municipality commences a qualified project under this subchapter
 before September 1, 2027 [2023].
 (f)  For purposes of Subsection (e), a municipality
 commences a qualified project on the date the municipality, by
 ordinance or resolution:
 (1)  authorizes the issuance of bonds or other
 obligations related to the qualified project; or
 (2)  executes:
 (A)  a contract authorized by Chapter 380, Local
 Government Code, related to the qualified project; or
 (B)  an interlocal agreement related to the
 qualified project.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *