Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3102 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2021

                            87R9315 MLH-D
 By: Campos H.B. No. 3102


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duties of the Texas Economic Development and
 Tourism Office's business permit office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.123, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 481.123.  DUTIES. The permit office shall:
 (1)  provide comprehensive information on permits
 required for business enterprises in the state and make that
 information available to applicants and other persons;
 (2)  assist applicants in obtaining timely and
 efficient permit review and in resolving issues arising from the
 review;
 (3)  facilitate contacts between applicants and state
 agencies responsible for processing and reviewing permit
 applications;
 (4)  assist applicants in the resolution of outstanding
 issues identified by state agencies, including delays experienced
 in permit review;
 (5)  develop comprehensive application procedures to
 expedite the permit process;
 (6)  compile a comprehensive list of all permits
 required of a person desiring to establish, operate, or expand a
 business enterprise in the state;
 (7)  encourage and facilitate the participation of
 federal and local government agencies in permit coordination;
 (8)  make recommendations for eliminating,
 consolidating, simplifying, expediting, or otherwise improving
 permit procedures affecting business enterprises by requesting
 that the state auditor, with the advice and support of the permit
 office, initiate a business permit reengineering review process
 involving all state agencies;
 (9)  develop and implement an outreach program to
 publicize and make small business entrepreneurs and others aware of
 services provided by the permit office;
 (10)  adopt rules, procedures, instructions, and forms
 required to carry out the functions, powers, and duties of the
 permit office under this subchapter; [and]
 (11)  except as provided in Section 481.129, complete
 the implementation of the business permit review process on or
 before September 1, 1994, and provide all recommended statutory
 changes as needed to the legislature on or before January 1, 1995;
 and
 (12)  conduct the biennial review required under
 Section 481.130.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 481, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 481.130 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.130.  BIENNIAL REVIEW OF PERMIT APPLICATION
 PROCESS. At least once every two years, the permit office shall:
 (1)  conduct a formal review to evaluate the permit
 application process, including:
 (A)  creating a flowchart of the process to assist
 in identifying deficiencies in the process; and
 (B)  identifying ways in which the process can be
 simplified or expedited; and
 (2)  based on the findings of the review:
 (A)  make recommendations for state agencies to
 improve the permit application process; and
 (B)  revise the comprehensive application
 procedure under 481.124 and any information prepared by the permit
 office, including the handbook under Section 481.125, as necessary
 to make the procedure and information more user-friendly.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2022, the Texas
 Economic Development and Tourism Office's business permit office
 shall complete the first review required by Section 481.130,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.