Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021