Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021