Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3212 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                    By: Sherman, Sr., Wu (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3212
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of information relating to street racing
 in the curriculum of driver education courses and driving safety
 courses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1001.1021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.1021.  INFORMATION RELATING TO STREET RACING. The
 commission by rule shall require that information relating to the
 dangers and consequences of street racing in violation of Section
 545.420, Transportation Code, be included in the curriculum of each
 driver education and driving safety course.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than May 1, 2022, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
 required by Section 1001.1021, Education Code, as added by this
 Act.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2022, each provider of a
 driver education course or a driving safety course shall certify to
 the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation that the course
 curriculum has been updated to include the information required by
 Section 1001.1021, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *