H.B. No. 3212 AN ACT relating to the inclusion of information relating to street racing in the curriculum of driver education courses and driving safety courses. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 1001.1021 to read as follows: Sec. 1001.1021. INFORMATION RELATING TO STREET RACING. The commission by rule shall require that information relating to the dangers and consequences of street racing in violation of Section 545.420, Transportation Code, be included in the curriculum of each driver education and driving safety course. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than May 1, 2022, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules required by Section 1001.1021, Education Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than September 1, 2022, each provider of a driver education course or a driving safety course shall certify to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation that the course curriculum has been updated to include the information required by Section 1001.1021, Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3212 was passed by the House on April 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 25, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3212 was passed by the Senate on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor