Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB33 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/21/2021

                    By: Dominguez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 33
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021;
 April 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 21, 2021, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 21, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to measures to facilitate the award of postsecondary
 course credit leading to workforce credentialing based on military
 experience, education, and training.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.3041(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  An institution of higher education shall consider, in
 determining whether to award to a student course credit toward a
 degree or certificate offered by the institution for the student's
 completion of certain military training:
 (1)  any official military record presented to the
 institution by the student that:
 (A)  describes the substance of the training
 completed by the student; and
 (B)  verifies the student's successful completion
 of that training; and
 (2)  whether the substance of that training satisfies
 the purpose of the course for which the student seeks credit as
 described in the institution's course catalog.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.026.  MEASURES TO FACILITATE AWARD OF COURSE CREDIT
 FOR MILITARY SERVICE. (a)  The commission shall evaluate programs
 of study or courses offered by career schools or colleges leading to
 industry-based certifications or other workforce credentials to
 identify programs or courses for which skills obtained through
 military experience, education, and training frequently align.
 (b)  The commission shall publish on its Internet website a
 list of any programs of study or courses identified by the
 commission under this section and the relevant military experience,
 education, or training that may align with those programs or
 courses.
 SECTION 3.  Section 132.055, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  In determining whether to approve a career school or
 college that offers a program of study or course listed on the
 commission's Internet website under Section 132.026(b), in
 addition to the criteria prescribed by Subsection (b) of this
 section, the commission shall require that the career school or
 college provide credit to a student toward any course time required
 for the program of study or course for skills obtained by the
 student through military experience, education, or training,
 unless the school or college can demonstrate that those skills are
 not appropriately aligned with the program of study or course.
 SECTION 4.  Section 302.0031, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (i) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Career school or college" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 132.001, Education Code.
 (2)  "Institution[, "institution] of higher education"
 has the meaning assigned by Section 61.003, Education Code.
 (i)  Under the program, the commission shall identify,
 develop, and support methods to facilitate the award of course time
 credit by career schools or colleges or other private or nonprofit
 entities providing programs of study or courses of instruction
 leading to industry certifications or other workforce credentials
 to veterans and military servicemembers for military experience,
 education, or training obtained during military service for
 programs of study or courses of instruction offered by those
 schools, colleges, or other entities for which skills obtained
 through military experience, education, and training align.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *